EP3708532 - MEMS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUELDNER, Marc Kiem-Pauli-Weg 61 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
WALTHER, Arnaud Hauptstrasse 53 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | König, Andreas Rudolf, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 19163178.7 | 15.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708532 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708532 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B81B3/0016 (EP);
B81B3/001 (KR,US);
H04R19/04 (CN,US);
B81B3/0072 (EP);
B81B7/0006 (KR);
B81B7/02 (CN,KR);
B81C1/00166 (CN);
H04R1/04 (US);
H04R19/005 (US);
H04R31/003 (US);
B81B2201/0221 (KR);
B81B2201/0257 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0127 (EP,US);
B81B2203/04 (US);
B81B2203/053 (EP);
H04R2201/003 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | MEMS-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/38] | English: | MEMS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEMS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 27.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012082325 (SAKURAUCHI KAZUSHI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2015060955 (CHEN KUN-LUNG [TW]); | [XI]US2019071305 (STRASSER JOHANN [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2013221453 | US2015289046 |