EP3522619 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malikie Innovations Limited The Glasshouses GH2 92 Georges Street Lower Dun Laoghaire, Dublin A96 VR66 / IE | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Zhijun 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 02 /
ZHU, Yajun 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 03 /
FREEMAN, David N. 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 04 /
PURNADI, Rene W. 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/32] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19163543.2 | 01.11.2013 | [2019/32] | Priority number, date | US201213667838 | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US201213667838 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522619 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522619 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/10, H04W48/20, H04W52/44, H04J11/00, H04W52/38, H04W16/32, H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W52/28, H04W52/02 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04J11/0093 (EP,US);
H04W36/0061 (US);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W52/02 (EP,US);
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04W52/143 (EP,US);
H04W52/245 (EP,US);
H04W52/283 (EP,US);
H04W52/386 (EP,US);
H04W52/44 (EP,US);
H04B17/27 (EP);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W16/32 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04W52/38, H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W52/28, H04W52/44, H04W36/00, H04W16/32, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION IN HETEROGENEN NETZWERKEN | [2019/32] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS | [2019/32] | French: | COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DANS DES RÉSEAUX HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 08.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13789954.8 / EP2915385 | Divisional application(s) | EP23179962.8 / EP4236483 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011099513 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 8-11 * abstract *; | [XYI]WO2011138351 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,12-14 * pages 3,7,10 * * pages 11,15,17 * * pages 18, 32 * * figure 1B * [Y] 8-11 [I] 7-11; | [YP]EP2536221 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [YP] 8-11* paragraphs [0163] - [0166] * |