EP3543473 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE HAVING A SPLITTER WITH A FLUSH-MOUNTED COMBINED STATIC PRESSURE AND TEMPERATURE PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/39] | FLUSH-MOUNT COMBINED STATIC PRESSURE AND TEMPERATURE PROBE | ||
[2020/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Lisa 15200 Wood Duck Trl NW Prior Lake, MN Minnesota 55372 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 19163896.4 | 19.03.2019 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201815934615 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: US201815934615 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3543473 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3543473 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543473 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/08, G01L19/00, G01K13/02 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
F01D17/085 (EP,US);
F01D17/08 (EP,US);
F23N5/022 (US);
F23N5/24 (US);
F23R3/46 (US);
G01K13/028 (EP,US);
G01L19/0092 (EP,US);
G01P13/025 (US);
G01P5/14 (US);
F05D2270/301 (EP,US);
F05D2270/3011 (EP,US);
F05D2270/303 (EP,US);
F05D2270/312 (EP,US);
F05D2270/313 (EP,US);
F05D2270/80 (EP,US);
F23N2225/04 (US);
F23N2225/21 (US);
F23N2241/20 (US);
G01L19/0681 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK MIT STRÖMUNGSTEILER MIT BÜNDIG ANGEORDNETER KOMBINIERTER SONDE FÜR STATISCHEN DRUCK UND TEMPERATUR | [2020/32] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE HAVING A SPLITTER WITH A FLUSH-MOUNTED COMBINED STATIC PRESSURE AND TEMPERATURE PROBE | [2020/32] | French: | TURBINE À GAZ AVEC DIVISEUR DE FLUX AYANT UNE SONDE COMBINÉE DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DE PRESSION STATIQUE MONTÉE EN AFFLEUREMENT | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/39] | BÜNDIG ANGEORDNETE KOMBINIERTE SONDE FÜR STATISCHEN DRUCK UND TEMPERATUR | ||
Former [2019/39] | FLUSH-MOUNT COMBINED STATIC PRESSURE AND TEMPERATURE PROBE | ||
Former [2019/39] | SONDE COMBINÉE DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DE PRESSION STATIQUE MONTÉ EN AFFLEUREMENT | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2019 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | ES | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | IE | 19.03.2021 | LU | 19.03.2021 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 19.03.2019 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.03.2019 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3605495 (KRAUSE LLOYD N, et al) [X] 4-7,15 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2124706 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-3 * page 1, lines 115-124; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE10232315 (TEMPERATURMESTECHNIK GERABERG [DE]) [X] 4,8,11 * paragraph [0027]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2004134282 (HAYASHI KYUTARO [JP], et al) [X] 4-6 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figure 1 *; | [A]US7111982 (SWONGER JR KARL WILLIAM [US]) [A] 4-8* figures 5-12 *; | [A]US2010250051 (NESTICO BRIAN FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP2402728 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 4-8,15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0032]; figure 5 * [I] 9; | [A]EP3199938 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * |