EP3546190 - INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOROZUMI, Tomohito Sumitomo Heavy Industries Ltd. Chiba Works, 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 263-0001 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Akihisa Sumitomo Heavy Industries Ltd. Chiba Works 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 263-0001 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yoshitada Sumitomo Heavy Industries Ltd. Chiba Works, 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 263-0001 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Yosuke Sumitomo Heavy Industries Ltd. Chiba Works 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 263-0001 / JP | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 19163929.3 | 20.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | JP20180068367 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018068367 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546190 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546190 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/83, // B29C45/68, B29C45/66, B29C45/17 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B29C45/83 (EP,CN);
B29C45/17 (CN);
B29C45/1761 (EP);
B29C45/661 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE | [2019/40] | English: | INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE | [2019/40] | French: | MACHINE DE MOULAGE À INJECTION | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 01.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09262884 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [X]JP2010234433 (UBE MACHINERY CORP LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]JP2012111197 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]CN205800023U (BORCH MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]DE102016119583 (ARBURG GMBH + CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0040] - [0043] - [0 47] - [0049]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2014054748 |