Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021254076 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201715695254 | 05.09.2017 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | US201514947025 | 20.11.2015 | US201816191579 | 15.11.2018 | US202017121885 | 15.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018087058 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201715695254 | 05.09.2017 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201514947025 | 20.11.2015 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9783806 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2016145629 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201514947025 | 20.11.2015 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10988768 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | B2 | US2020392511 | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201715695254 | 05.09.2017 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | US201514947025 | 20.11.2015 | US202016996089 | 18.08.2020 | US201816191579 | 15.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10913950 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | B2 | US2019211341 | 11.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201715695254 | 05.09.2017 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201514947025 | 20.11.2015 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | US201816191579 | 15.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102486617B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2023 | B1 | KR20220025273 | 03.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | KR20217008872 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102365809B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2022 | B1 | KR20210037730 | 06.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | KR20157035878 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102234623B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2021 | B1 | KR20160009687 | 26.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023061967 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | JP2021018231 | 08.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7437891B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2024 | B2 | JP2019214587 | 19.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | JP2016515086 | 22.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016520593 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL313320 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL293657 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | B1 | IL293657 | 01.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL285780 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | B | IL285780 | 30.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL280153 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2021 | B | IL280153 | 01.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL242701 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3828276 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14730723 | 22.05.2014 | EP19164080 | 22.05.2014 | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2999786 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110317810 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | CN201480040477 | 22.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105452463B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2019 | B | CN105452463 | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023201014 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | AU2023201014 | 21.02.2023 | AU2014268529 | 22.05.2014 | AU2020207874 | 24.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020207874B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2022 | B2 | AU2020207874 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | AU2014268529 | 22.05.2014 | AU2020207874 | 24.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014268529C | Global Dossier | 01.10.2020 | C1 | AU2014268529B | 30.04.2020 | B2 | AU2014268529 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3587578 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14730723 | 22.05.2014 | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR096392 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015029276 | 12.07.2022 | B1 | BR112015029276 | 19.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2912834 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3178370 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | CA2912834 | 22.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201592225 | 29.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1221978 | 16.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY181888 | 12.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ714577 | 26.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015154738 | 27.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201510565T | 28.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | WO2014US39149 | 22.05.2014 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014190157 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2015 | A8 | WO2014190157 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021075554 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2015003440 | 09.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021002998 | 09.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10202103166X | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI727917B | 21.05.2021 | B | TW201536916 | 01.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202124715 | 01.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202342750 | 01.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY35583 | 31.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202110854 | 24.04.2024 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361826178 | 22.05.2013 | US201361912988 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3828276 | Type | Earlier application | EP2999786 |