EP3587578 - TMPRSS6 IRNA COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, James c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
BETTENCOURT, Brian c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
RAJEEV, Kallanthottathil, G. c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
MAIER, Martin c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
CHARISSE, Klaus c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19164080.4 | 22.05.2014 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | US201361826178P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826178 P | US201361912988P | 06.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361912988 P | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587578 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713, C12N9/64 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/1137 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/1138 (IL,US);
A61K31/713 (IL,KR);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61P25/16 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/113 (IL,US);
C12N9/6424 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/316 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/32 (IL,KR);
C12N2310/321 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/343 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3521 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | 20.04.2019 | ME | 20.04.2019 | Title | German: | TMPRSS6-IRNA-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/01] | English: | TMPRSS6 IRNA COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2020/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ARNI TMPRSS6 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14730723.5 / EP2999786 | Divisional application(s) | EP20212208.1 / EP3828276 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009073809 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2012135246 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3687808 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4683202 | WO8804924 | US4837028 | US4845205 | US4897355 | US4981957 | US5023243 | US5034506 | WO9116024 | US5118800 | US5134066 | US5139941 | US5166315 | US5171678 | US5175273 | US5177195 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5216141 | US5235033 | US5252479 | US5264423 | US5264564 | WO9324641 | WO9324640 | US5276019 | WO9400569 | US5278302 | US5283185 | WO9402595 | US5286717 | US5319080 | WO9412649 | US5321131 | WO9413788 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5436146 | US5446137 | US5445934 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5489677 | US5502177 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541316 | US5541307 | US5543152 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5567811 | US5571799 | US5576427 | WO9637194 | WO9640964 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5591722 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5597909 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | WO9730731 | US5663312 | US5665557 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5677195 | US5681941 | US5700920 | US5705188 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5744305 | US5750692 | US5770722 | WO9839359 | US5854033 | US5874219 | US5976567 | US5981276 | US5981501 | US6015886 | WO0003683 | US6028188 | WO0022113 | WO0022114 | US6054299 | US6124445 | US6143520 | US6147200 | US6160109 | US6166197 | US6169170 | US6172209 | US6191105 | US6222025 | US6235887 | US6239265 | US6268490 | US6277603 | US6326199 | US6346614 | US6380368 | US6444423 | US2003027780 | US6528640 | US6531590 | US6534639 | US6534484 | US6586410 | US2003144217 | US6608035 | US6617438 | US6639062 | US6670461 | US6683167 | US6747014 | US2004127488 | US2004167116 | US6794499 | US6815432 | US6858715 | US6867294 | US6878805 | US6887906 | US2005148548 | US6998484 | US7015315 | US7041816 | US7045610 | US7053207 | US7063860 | US7070802 | US7084125 | US7157099 | USRE39464E | WO2007091269 | US7273933 | WO2007117686 | US7321029 | WO2008042973 | US7399845 | US7427672 | US7427605 | WO2009014887 | US7495088 | WO2010141511 | US2010324120 | US7858769 | WO2011005860 | WO2011005861 | WO2011031520 | US8101348 | US20040916185 | US20040946873 | US20050115989 | US20070833934 | WO2007US80331 | US20070944227 | US20080018616 | US20080018611 | US20080039748 | US20080056230 | US20080047087 | US20080051528 | US20080107998 | US20090148366 | US20090156851 | US20090175770 | US20090239686 | WO2009US63933 | WO2010US22614 | WO2010US33777 | WO2012US65601 | WO2012US65691 |