EP3524725 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ELIMINATING WRINKLES IN CLOTHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/23] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun Sook 135-1703, Whanggolmaeul Apt. Yeongtong-Dong Yeo Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyung Gyoon 108-203, SsangYong Apt., Mangpo-Dong Yeongtong-G Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
PARK, Seon Woo 922-401, Byeokjeokgol Samsung Apt. Yeongtong-Do Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
OAK, Seong Min 659-7, Yangdeok-2-Dong Hoewon-Gu Masan-Si Gyeongsangnam-Do / KR | 05 /
PARK, Jee Hun 34/3, 171-8, Godeung-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 06 /
LEE, Yoon Sook 304, 990-21 Yeongtong-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Rose, Kathryn Clare Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/23] |
Former [2019/33] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19164112.5 | 15.07.2005 | [2019/33] | Priority number, date | KR20040100610 | 02.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040100610 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524725 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3524725 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/65, // D06F35/00, D06F39/00, D06F58/20, D06F25/00, D06F103/32, D06F105/28, D06F105/30 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06F33/65 (EP,US);
D06F58/44 (EP,US);
D06F2101/00 (EP,US);
D06F2105/38 (EP,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | D06F35/00, D06F25/00, D06F58/20, D06F39/00, D06F58/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FALTEN IN KLEIDUNG | [2019/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ELIMINATING WRINKLES IN CLOTHES | [2019/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR ELIMINER LES RIDES DANS DES VETEMENTS | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05106546.4 / EP1666655 | EP14194560.0 / EP2857570 | EP18154244.0 / EP3333300 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0038672 (SERVIS DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14* figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2002010964 (DEAK JOHN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1464751 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR0128148B | KR100435241B |