EP3546207 - ENERGY ABSORBING COMPOSITE PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLUKBASI, Akif O c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
GLEASON, Timothy R c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
HOLEMANS, Peter c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/44] |
Former [2019/40] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19164176.0 | 20.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US201815937414 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US201815937414 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546207 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546207 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/28, B32B5/18, B32B7/02, // B64C1/00, B64D37/02, B60K15/03 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B3/12 (CN);
B64D37/32 (US);
B32B15/046 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/08 (CN);
B32B15/20 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/065 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/08 (CN);
B32B27/20 (CN);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/38 (CN);
B32B3/18 (EP,US);
B32B3/28 (EP,CN,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,US);
B32B5/145 (US);
B32B5/18 (EP,CN,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/022 (EP,US);
B60K15/03 (US);
B60K15/03177 (EP,US);
B64C1/062 (EP,CN,US);
B64D37/02 (US);
B64D37/06 (EP);
B64U20/65 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2266/06 (EP,US);
B32B2266/08 (EP,US);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2307/50 (CN);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/56 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2439/40 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2015/03407 (EP,US);
B60K2015/0631 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/50 (EP,US);
B60Y2306/01 (EP,US);
B64D2037/325 (US);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | ENERGIEABSORBIERENDE VERBUNDPLATTEN | [2019/40] | English: | ENERGY ABSORBING COMPOSITE PANELS | [2019/40] | French: | PANNEAUX COMPOSITES À ABSORPTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014120317 (ZAFIRIS GEORGIOS S [US], et al); | [XAI]NL2016206B (ZIH B V [NL]) |