EP3674927 - CONFIGURING DATA PROCESSING PIPELINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 1200 17th Street, Floor 15 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2022/48] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUKLA, Saurabh Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
HARISH, Subbanarasimhiah Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
PANDEY, Harsh Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 04 /
BOAM, Thomas Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 05 /
GANESH, Vinoo Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19164518.3 | 22.03.2019 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | GB20180021239 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: GB 201821239 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674927 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/18, G06F16/2455, G06F16/25 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP);
G06F11/3452 (US);
G06F11/302 (US);
G06F16/2456 (US);
G06F16/24568 (EP);
G06F16/254 (EP);
G06F16/258 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURATION VON DATENVERARBEITUNGSPIPELINES | [2020/27] | English: | CONFIGURING DATA PROCESSING PIPELINES | [2020/27] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE PIPELINES DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3128447 (PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004]; figure 1 *; | [A] - ZSOLT ISTVAN ET AL, "Histograms as a side effect of data movement for big data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2014 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, SIGMOD '14, New York, New York, USA, (20140622), doi:10.1145/2588555.2612174, ISBN 978-1-4503-2376-5, pages 1567 - 1578, XP055649277 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2588555.2612174 | [A] - Q. ZHU ET AL, "Piggyback Statistics Collection for Query Optimization: Towards a Self-Maintaining Database Management System", COMPUTER JOURNAL., GB, (200402), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1093/comjnl/47.2.221, ISSN 0010-4620, pages 221 - 244, XP055649285 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 1, paragraphs 5 and 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/47.2.221 |