Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019297737 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018057550 | 26.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019169654 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018057550 | 26.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110364870 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018057550 | 26.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3547810 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018057550 | 26.03.2018 |