Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3552788 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | B1 | EP3552788 | 16.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1853058 | 09.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3079770 | 27.03.2020 | B1 | FR3079770 | 11.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1853058 | 09.04.2018 |