EP3546757 - SCROLL COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Takumi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
OTA, Takayuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 03 /
TOZAWA, Kosaku c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Takuro c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 05 /
HATTORI, Yuya c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 06 /
TOMOTA, Tatsunori c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | 07 /
KONDOH, Yasuhiro c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | 08 /
SHIBATA, Kazuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | 09 /
HORI, Etsuko c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | 10 /
SUZUKI, Hideyuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | 11 /
FUKAWA, Kimihiro c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Yokomichi Nagakute-shi, Aichi 480-1192 / JP | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 19165441.7 | 27.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | JP20180060410 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018060410 | JP20190053652 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019053652 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546757 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546757 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,CN,US);
F04C18/0269 (EP,CN,US);
F04C18/0246 (EP,US);
F04C2240/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | SPIRALVERDICHTER | [2019/40] | English: | SCROLL COMPRESSOR | [2019/40] | French: | COMPRESSEUR À SPIRALES | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 06.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2019 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | IT | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | IE | 27.03.2021 | LU | 27.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 27.03.2019 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.03.2019 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4304535 (TERAUCHI KIYOSHI) [A] 1-3 * figures 1a-1d *; | [A]US4490099 (TERAUCHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* figures 1a-1d *; | [AD]JPH0735058 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [AD] 1-3 * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JPH0735058 |