EP3547719 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A MICROPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAE Inc. 8585 Côte-de-Liesse Saint-Laurent, Québec H4T 1G6 / CA | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYOTTE, Maxime c/o CAE INC. 8585 Côte-de-Liesse SAINT-LAURENT, Québec H4T 1G6 / CA | 02 /
DESMET, Laurent c/o CAE INC. 8585 Côte-de-Liesse SAINT-LAURENT, Québec H4T 1G6 / CA | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 19165707.1 | 28.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | CA20183000122 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: CA 3000122 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3547719 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, G01S5/30 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G01S5/30 (EP,US);
H04R29/004 (US);
G01S5/24 (CN);
G10L25/51 (CN);
H04R1/403 (US);
H04R3/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER POSITION EINES MIKROFONS | [2019/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A MICROPHONE | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER UNE POSITION D'UN MICROPHONE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3211921 (ONKYO KK [JP]) [I] 1-15 * column 2, paragraph 7 - column 6, paragraph 26 * * column 6, paragraph 27 - column 8, paragraph 32 * * figures 1-6 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP3258709 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 2,3,6,7,10,11,14,15 * column 8, paragraph 48 * * column 20, paragraph 140 - column 22, paragraph 149 ** figure 1 * |