Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102655695B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2024 | B1 | KR20220136327 | 07.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 | KR20220123574 | 28.09.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10804334 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | B2 | US2019348470 | 14.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102450398B | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190130697 | 25.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110491901B | Global Dossier | 09.08.2024 | B | CN110491901 | 22.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3570328 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 |