EP3718751 - MANUFACTURING OF AN INFLATABLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO CAR CORPORATION 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hjerpe, Erik Tallbacksvägen 7 423 61 Torslanda / SE | 02 /
Nuzzo, Nathan Maria Bangate 2b 11863 Stockholm / SE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19166581.9 | 01.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718751 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/62, B29C65/72, B29C65/00, B60N2/28 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
B29D22/02 (EP);
D05B19/00 (CN);
B32B7/09 (US);
B05D7/00 (CN);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B37/0076 (US);
B32B37/16 (US);
B32B38/0004 (US);
B32B41/00 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
D05B21/00 (US);
D05B35/00 (CN);
D05B65/00 (CN);
D06H7/00 (US);
D06N3/0013 (US);
D06N3/0088 (US);
B29L2022/02 (EP);
B32B2038/008 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2255/02 (US);
B32B2305/18 (US);
B32B2309/70 (US);
B60N2002/2896 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER AUFBLASBAREN STRUKTUR | [2020/41] | English: | MANUFACTURING OF AN INFLATABLE STRUCTURE | [2020/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DEFABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE GONFLABLE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/41] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/41] | 13.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 07.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2657716 (FORD CHARLES J); | [A]JPS5388887 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [XI]US2012011642 (DAINESE LINO [IT], et al); | [A]EP2502780 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]); | [A]WO2016145239 (BRADLEY TODD [US]); | [XI]EP3167730 (DAINESE SPA [IT]); | [A]US2018208272 (HOPKINS WILLIAM LUCAS [US]); | [X]KR20190004053 (SUNGWON IND CO LTD [KR], et al) |