EP3527852 - WORK VEHICLE TRANSMISSION AND WORK VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANA, Hidetoshi KUBOTA CORPORATION c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 02 /
TSUCHIDA, Tomonari KUBOTA CORPORATION c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 03 /
TAKEWA, Noriaki KUBOTA CORPORATION c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Satoshi KUBOTA CORPORATION c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 05 /
MAEDA, Kazuya KUBOTA CORPORATION c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, Osaka 5900823 / JP | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 19166589.2 | 07.06.2018 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | JP20170122616 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122616 | JP20170122617 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122617 | JP20170122618 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122618 | JP20170122619 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122619 | JP20170122620 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122620 | JP20170122621 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122621 | JP20170122622 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122622 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527852 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3527852 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04, // F16H61/00, F16H37/04 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F16D21/04 (EP);
F16H3/093 (CN);
F16H3/091 (US);
B60K17/08 (CN);
F15B21/041 (US);
F16D25/10 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (CN);
F16H37/043 (EP,US);
F16H37/0813 (US);
F16H48/19 (US);
F16H61/0009 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/0265 (CN);
F16H63/3026 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/14 (EP,US);
F16D25/0638 (EP);
F16H2003/0811 (CN);
F16H2003/0818 (EP,US);
F16H2037/044 (EP,US);
F16H2037/045 (EP,US);
F16H2037/049 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0046 (EP,US);
F16H2200/006 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0078 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2051 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | ARBEITSFAHRZEUGGETRIEBE UND ARBEITSFAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2019/34] | English: | WORK VEHICLE TRANSMISSION AND WORK VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME | [2019/34] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL ET VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL LA COMPRENANT | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18176582.7 / EP3428480 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2018 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | IE | 07.06.2021 | LU | 07.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.06.2018 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 07.06.2018 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.06.2018 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6241228U ; | [XA]JP2002106694 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US2012073905 (AIDA KEI [JP]) | by applicant | JP082267A | US5599247 | JP2001105912 |