EP3546587 - PROCESSING BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xyleco, Inc. 360 Audubon Road Wakefield, MA 01880-6248 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDOFF, Marshall 90 Addington Rd. Brookline, Massachusetts 02146 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai, et al Von Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 19166680.9 | 28.04.2009 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US20080049419P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 49419 P | US20084941508P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 4941508 P | US20084941308P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 4941308 P | US20084940408P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 4940408 P | US20087349608P | 18.06.2008 Original published format: US 7349608 P | US200941788009 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 41788009 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546587 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/10, C12P7/06, C12P7/16, C08H8/00, C08J3/28 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
C12P7/10 (EP,CN,US);
C12P19/14 (CN);
C08H8/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08J3/28 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (CN);
C12P5/02 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/04 (CN);
C12P7/06 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/16 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2397/02 (EP,US);
C12P2201/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12P2203/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2019/40] | English: | PROCESSING BIOMASS | [2019/40] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE BIOMASSE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09747143.7 / EP2285972 | EP17200134.9 / EP3305906 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - BRENNER W ET AL, "Radiation pretreatments for optimizing the sugar yield in the acid hydrolysis of waste cellulose", RADIATION PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 14, no. 3-6, doi:10.1016/0146-5724(79)90069-4, ISSN 0146-5724, (19790101), pages 299 - 308, (19790101), XP025651773 [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * page 303, paragraph l * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0146-5724(79)90069-4 | [XI] - KUMAKURA M ET AL, "Effect of electron beam current on radiation pretreatment of cellulosic wastes with electron beam accelerator", RADIATION PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0146-5724(84)90154-7, ISSN 0146-5724, (19840101), pages 523 - 527, (19840101), XP024584650 [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * page 523, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 525, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0146-5724(84)90154-7 | [X] - LEPIFRE S ET AL, "Lignin incorporation combined with electron-beam irradiation improves the surface water resistance of starch films", BIOMACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1021/BM040005E, ISSN 1525-7797, (20040901), pages 1678 - 1686, (20040629), XP002605572 [X] 1,4,7-10 * page 1679, column l, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 1680, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM040005E | [XI] - KHAN A W ET AL, "EFFECT OF ELECTRON-BEAM IRRADIATION PRETREATMENT ON THE ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS OF SOFTWOOD", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY ETC, (19860101), vol. 28, no. 9, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1449 - 1453, XP002605591 [X] 10 * page 1449, column l, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 1449, column r, paragraph 2; figures 1, 2 * * page 1452, column l, paragraph 4 - page 1453, column l, paragraph l; figure 4; tables I, II * [I] 1-9 | [X] - HON NYOK-SAI, COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (197510), Database accession no. EIX76050000798, XP002793604 [X] 1,10 * abstract * | [ ] - J POLYM SCI POLYM CHEM ED 1975 OCT, (197510), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 2363 - 2374 | [X] - HIROSHI TAUCHI ET AL, "Accumulation of Cells at G2/M Stage by Low Dose-Rate Irradiation Renders the Cell Population More Susceptible to the Subsequent Induction of 6-Thioguanine-Resistant Mutations by 252Cf Fission Neutrons.", JOURNAL OF RADIATION RESEARCH, JP, (19960101), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1269/jrr.37.49, ISSN 0449-3060, pages 49 - 57, XP055613696 [X] 1,6,8,10 * page 50, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1269/jrr.37.49 | by applicant | US3844890 | US4094742 | US4292406 | US4435307 | EP0458162 | US5370999 | US5766764 | US5828156 | US5942649 | US5952105 | US5973035 | US6207729 | US6258876 | US6383152 | US6448307 | US6624539 | US6883667 | US2006008885 | US2006068475 | WO2006110891 | WO2006128304 | US7166650 | US7192772 | WO2007071818 | WO2008011598 | US2008067724 | WO2008073186 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 9005-25-8 | - KRSTO PTELEC, FIZIK A B 6, (19970000), vol. 4, pages 177 - 206 | - BOUCHARD et al., Cellulose, (20060000), vol. 13, pages 601 - 610 | - BARTOLOTTA, Physics in Medicine and Biology, (20010000), vol. 46, pages 461 - 471 | - BARTOLOTTA et al., Radiation Protection Dosimetry, (19990000), vol. 84, no. I -4, pages 293 - 296 | - SUSLICK et al., Nature, vol. 434, pages 52 - 55 | - SUSLICK et al., Ann. Rev. Mater. Sci., (19990000), vol. 29, page 295 | - SUSLICK et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 353, page 414 | - HILLER et al., Phys. Rev. Lett., (19920000), vol. 69, page 1182 | - BARBER et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, page 414 | - SUSLICK et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19860000), vol. 108, page 5641 | - TANG et al., Chern. Comm., (20000000), page 2119 | - WANG et al., Advanced Mater., (20000000), vol. 12, page 1137 | - LANDAU et al., J. of Catalysis, (20010000), vol. 201, page 22 | - PERKAS et al., Chem. Comm., (20010000), vol. 988 | - SHAFT et al., J. Phys. Chem B, (19990000), vol. 103, page 3358 | - AVIVI et al., J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (19990000), vol. 121, page 4196 | - AVIVI et al., J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (20000000), vol. 122, page 4331 | - "Cellulose bioconversion technology", PHILIPPIDIS, G. P., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, Taylor & Francis, (19960000), pages 179 - 212 | - LESCHINE, International Journal of Systematic and Evolutionary Microbiology, (20020000), vol. 52, pages 1155 - 1 160 | - SONNE-HANSEN et al., Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 38, pages 537 - 541 | - AHRING et al., Arch. Microbiol., (19970000), vol. 168, pages 114 - 119 | - LCSCHINC, International Journal of Systematic and Evolutionary Microbiology, (20020000), vol. 52, pages 1155 - 1160 | - GHOSE, Pure and Appl. Chem., (19370000), vol. 59, pages 257 - 268 | - SHEEHAN, Biotechnology Progress, (19990000), vol. 15, page 8179 | - MARTIN, Enzyme Microbes Technology, (20020000), vol. 31, page 274 | - GREER, BioCycle, (20050400), pages 61 - 65 | - LYND, Microbiology and Molecular Biology Reviews, (20020000), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 506 - 577 | - HOPE; DEAN, Biotech J., (19740000), vol. 144, page 403 | US20090049391 | US20060453951 | US20060832735 | WO2007US22719 | US20080049394 | US20080049395 | US20080049404 | US20080049405 | US20080049406 | US20080049407 | US20080049413 | US20080049415 | US20080049419 | US20080073432 | US20080073436 | US20080073496 | US20080073530 | US20080073665 | US20080073674 | US20080106861 | US20080139324 | US20080139453 | US20090417707 | US20090417720 | US20090417840 | US20090417699 | US20090417731 | US20090417900 | US20090417880 | US20090417723 | US20090417786 | US20090417904 |