EP3718602 - MULTICOMPONENT CRYSTAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick V94 T9PX / IE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAVANAGH, Oisín c/o University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick, V94 T9PX / IE | 02 /
LUSI, Matteo c/o University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick, V94 T9PX / IE | 03 /
WALKER, Gavin c/o University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick, V94 T9PX / IE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19166734.4 | 02.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718602 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/08, A61K31/19, A61K31/53, A61K45/06, C07D253/02, A61K9/14 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/192 (US);
A61K31/43 (US);
A61K31/431 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/4995 (US);
A61K31/545 (US);
A61K31/546 (US);
A61K31/606 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/14 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
C07C53/128 (EP);
C07D253/075 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTENKRISTALLFORMULIERUNGEN | [2020/41] | English: | MULTICOMPONENT CRYSTAL FORMULATIONS | [2020/41] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE CRISTAL MULTICOMPOSANTS | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009061513 (THAR PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15 * figure -; examples 8,9,10 *; | [A]CN103360331B (UNIV TIANJIN) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - THIPPARABOINA R. ET AL., "Ionic, neutral, and hybrid acid-base crystalline adducts of lamotrigine with improved pharmaceutical performance", CRYSTAL GROWTH AND DESIGN, (2015), vol. 15, pages 5816 - 5826, XP002793972 [X] 1-7,9-15 * figures 9,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.cgd.5b01187 | [X] - CHENEY M.L. ET AL., "Effects of crystal form on solubility and pharmacokinetics: a crystal engineering case study of lamotrigine", CRYSTAL GROWTH AND DESIGN, (2010), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 394 - 405, XP002793973 [X] 1-6,9-15 * page 397, column l; figures 1,11,12,13; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cg901010v | by applicant | - S.M. BERGE, "Pharmaceutical Salts", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - S. BYRN, Pharmaceutical Research, (19950000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 954 - 954 | - R. LIU, Water- Insoluble Drug Formulation, CRC Press, page 553 |