Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3530225 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480015446 EP14713646 EP19166823 JP2016500534 KR20157028891 US201313827184 US2014019774W US201414774563



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9572610Global Dossier 21.02.2017B2
US2014277174 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10028779Global Dossier 24.07.2018B2
US2016038198 11.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
US201414774563 03.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150127261Global Dossier 16.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6502313BGlobal Dossier 17.04.2019B2
JP2016511061 14.04.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2994064Global Dossier 08.05.2019B1
EP2994064 16.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105073044BGlobal Dossier 17.11.2017B
CN105073044 18.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3530225Global Dossier 28.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
EP14713646 03.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112015022735 18.07.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2905770 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US19774 03.03.2014
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014158740Global Dossier 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361783482 14.03.2013
US201313827184 14.03.2013
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2994064