EP3572425 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR COUNTERACTING MYELOPROLIFERATIVE OR LYMPHOPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | 27.08.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kling Biotherapeutics B.V. Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | [2021/27] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states AIMM Therapeutics B.V. Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spits, Hergen c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | 02 /
Beaumont, Tim c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | 03 /
Gillissen, Marijn Aletta c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | 04 /
Bakker, Adrianus Quirinus c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | 05 /
Hazenberg, Mette Deborah c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | 06 /
Kedde, Martijn c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 19166848.2 | 17.12.2014 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | EP20130197882 | 17.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13197882 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572425 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/06, C07K16/30, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61K47/68 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/3061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K16/06 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (US);
C12P21/005 (US);
G01N33/56966 (CN);
G01N33/57407 (CN);
G01N33/57426 (CN,KR);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/505 (CN,KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (CN,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/732 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C07K16/06, C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN GEGEN MYELOPROLIFERATIVE ODER LYMPHOPROLIFERATIVE ERKRANKUNGEN | [2019/48] | English: | MEANS AND METHODS FOR COUNTERACTING MYELOPROLIFERATIVE OR LYMPHOPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS | [2019/48] | French: | MOYENS ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION DES TROUBLES MYÉLOPROLIFÉRATIFS OU LYMPHOPROLIFÉRATIFS | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14825462.6 / EP3083678 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.12.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/13] | 01.06.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/17] | 01.12.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/17] | Cited in | by applicant | WO2007067046 | WO2009051974 | WO2010087994 | WO2010102244 | WO2012098407 | WO2013071068 |