EP3553209 - SURFACE TREATMENT DEVICE, SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD AND PADDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 2-6, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Tomoji c/o Hirakata Machinery Plant C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | 02 /
MATSUYAMA, Daisuke c/o Hirakata Machinery Plant C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | 03 /
KISO, Masayuki c/o Central Research Laboratory C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Daisuke c/o Central Research Laboratory C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | 05 /
OKADA, Akira c/o Central Research Laboratory C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | 06 /
TANIGUCHI, Keita c/o Central Research Laboratory C. Uyemura & Co., Ltd. 5-1, Deguchi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka, 573-0065 / JP | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19167344.1 | 04.04.2019 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | JP20180075360 | 10.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018075360 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553209 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25D21/10 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
C25D21/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B05C3/04 (US);
B05C3/09 (US);
C23C18/1628 (KR,US);
C23C18/1669 (KR);
C25D17/00 (CN);
C25D17/001 (US);
C25D17/02 (US);
B01F31/441 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND PADDEL | [2019/42] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT DEVICE, SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD AND PADDLE | [2019/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET PALETTE | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 26.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005089645 (KEIGLER ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-10 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0093] - [0099] * * figures 10,12-13 *; | [XI]US2009139871 (SAITO NOBUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0112] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 5; | [X]US2016068988 (UZOH CYPRIAN EMEKA [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0030] - [0048] * * figures 5-9 ** paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | JP4365143B | JP2018075360 |