EP3572092 - RECOMBINANT GALLID HERPESVIRUS 3 (MDV SEROTYPE 2) VECTORS EXPRESSING ANTIGENS OF AVIAN PATHOGENS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. 3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUBLOT, Michel 3 Rue Favre Garin 69630 Chaponost / FR | 02 /
MEBATSION, Teshome 2670 Bent Tree Lane Watkinsville, GA 30677 / US | 03 /
PRITCHARD, Joyce 3804 Princeton Court Gainesville, GA 30504 / US | 04 /
LINZ, Perry 2286 Cotton Gin Row Jefferson, GA 30549 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19167408.4 | 29.11.2012 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | US201161564877P | 30.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161564877 P | US201261694957P | 30.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261694957 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572092 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,CN);
C12N15/869 (RU);
A61K39/15 (RU);
A61K39/17 (RU);
A61K39/255 (RU);
A61K39/295 (RU);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07K14/03 (RU);
C07K14/125 (RU);
C07K14/14 (RU);
C12N15/63 (RU);
C12N15/86 (CN);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,CN);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/552 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP,CN);
C12N2710/16034 (EP);
C12N2710/16041 (EP);
C12N2710/16043 (CN);
C12N2710/16071 (EP);
C12N2710/16343 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE GALLID-HERPESVIRUS 3 (MDV-SEROTYP 2)-VEKTOREN, DIE ANTIGENE VON GEFLÜGELPATHOGENEN EXPRIMIEREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2019/48] | English: | RECOMBINANT GALLID HERPESVIRUS 3 (MDV SEROTYPE 2) VECTORS EXPRESSING ANTIGENS OF AVIAN PATHOGENS AND USES THEREOF | [2019/48] | French: | VECTEURS RECOMBINANTS DE GALLID HERPÈSVIRUS 3 (MDV SÉROTYPE 2) EXPRIMANT DES ANTIGÈNES DE PATHOGÈNES AVIAIRES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/40] |
Former [2023/40] | VECTEURS RECOMBINANTS DE GALLID HERPÈSVIRUS 3 (MDV SÉROTYPE 2) EXPRIMANT DES ANTIGÈNES DE PATHOGÈNES AVIAIRES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12801680.5 / EP2785373 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20010095727 (REP KR NAT VETERINARY RESEARCH [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [XI]KR20010095727 (REP KR NAT VETERINARY RESEARCH [KR]) [X] 1 * Google and human translations of KR 2001 0095727 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1298139 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0005] * * examples 6, 7 * [I] 2-10; | [YD] - WITTER R L ET AL, "POLYVALENT MAREKS DISEASE VACCINES SAFETY EFFICACY AND PROTECTIVE SYNERGISM IN CHICKENS WITH MATERNAL ANTIBODIES", AVIAN PATHOLOGY, (1984), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0307-9457, pages 75 - 92, XP002794879 [YD] 10-15 * abstract * * table 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03079458408418510 | [Y] - BUBLOT ET AL, "Use of a Vectored Vaccine against Infectious Bursal Disease of Chickens in the Face of High-Titred Maternally Derived Antibody", JOURNAL OF COMPARATIVE PATHOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20070628), vol. 137, doi:10.1016/J.JCPA.2007.04.017, ISSN 0021-9975, pages S81 - S84, XP022128831 [Y] 10-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcpa.2007.04.017 | [A] - PETHERBRIDGE L ET AL, "Cloning of Gallid herpesvirus 3 (Marek's disease virus serotype-2) genome as infectious bacterial artificial chromosomes for analysis of viral gene functions", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 158, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JVIROMET.2009.01.009, ISSN 0166-0934, (20090601), pages 11 - 17, (20090131), XP026022528 [A] 1-15 * page 13, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 11, column r, line 7 - line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2009.01.009 | [A] - SLACUM ET AL, "The compatibility of HVT recombinants with other Marek's disease vaccines", 58TH WESTERN POULTRY DISEASE CONFERENCE, SACRAMENTO, CA, USA, MARCH 23-25 2009,, (20090101), page 84, XP009167868 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US13689572 | WO8704463 | EP0517292 | US5187087 | US5650153 | WO9816247 | US5853733 | US5980906 | US5980912 | US6183753 | US6299882 | US6866852 | - BUBLOT et al., J.Comp. Path., (20070000), vol. 137, pages S81 - S84 | - MORGAN et al., Avian dis., (19920000), vol. 36, pages 858 - 70 | - JOHNSON et al., Avian Dis, (20100000), vol. 54, pages 1251 - 1259 | - SLACUM G; HEIN R; LYNCH P., "The compatibility of HVT recombinants with other Marek's disease vaccines", Western Poultry Disease Conference, (20090000), page 84, XP009167868 | - PETHERBRIDGE et al., J. Virol. Methods, (20090000), vol. 158, pages 11 - 17 | - SINGH et al., Research in Veterinary Science, (20100000), vol. 89, pages 140 - 145 | - SPATZ; SCHAT, Virus Gene, (20110000), vol. 42, pages 331 - 338 | - IGARASHI T. et al., J. Gen. Virol., (19890000), vol. 70, pages 1789 - 1804 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. HQ840738.1 | - PONTAROLLO R.A. et al., Vet. Immunol. Immunopath, (20020000), vol. 84, pages 43 - 59 | - WERNETTE C.M. et al., Vet. Immunol. Immunopath, (20020000), vol. 84, pages 223 - 236 | - MUTWIRI G. et al., Vet. Immunol. Immunopath, (20030000), vol. 91, pages 89 - 103 | - "Vaccine Design The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach", Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, vol. 6, page 3,157 | - M. POWELL; M. NEWMAN, Vaccine Design, The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, Plenum Press, (19950000), page 147 | - WISE et al., "Development of a Real-Time Reverse-Transcription PCR for Detection of Newcastle Disease Virus RNA in Clinical Samples", J Clin Microbiol, (20040000), vol. 42, pages 329 - 338 |