EP3578369 - RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKA, Kazuo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Kazuhisa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Satoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Haruna c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 05 /
SASAKI, Keisuke c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19167642.8 | 05.04.2019 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | JP20180073246 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018073246 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578369 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578369 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/60, B41J13/00, B41J13/10 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B41J13/0045 (EP);
B41J11/007 (US);
B41J13/0018 (EP);
B41J13/0036 (EP);
B41J13/103 (EP);
B41J13/106 (EP);
B41J3/60 (EP);
B65H15/00 (CN);
B65H2301/333 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/50] | English: | RECORDING APPARATUS | [2019/50] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 01.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013093822 (OIZUMI TAKAO [JP]) [I] 1-12* paragraphs [0042] - [0065] - [ 0086]; figure 1 *; | [XAI]US2015050045 (SATO SHOUGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * paragraphs [0037] - [0044] - [ 0052] - [0059] - [ 0232] - [0250]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,5,6,10 [I] 11,12; | [XAI]US2015274477 (KODAMA HIDETOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0045] - [0073]; figure 2 * [A] 2,3,9 [I] 5,6,10-12; | [I]US2017217221 (OTSUKA KAZUO [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0041] - [0058] - [ 0084] - [0100]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2003171062 | JP20180073246 |