EP3553243 - LAMINATED LOG STRUCTURE, METHOD AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honkarakenne Oyj Lahdentie 870 04400 Tuusula / FI | [2022/19] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Honkarakenne, Oyj Lahdentgie 870 04400 Tuusula / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINTAMÄKI, Jukka Kielotie 17 A 15 01300 Vantaa / FI | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 19167747.5 | 08.04.2019 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | FI20180005329 | 09.04.2018 Original published format: FI 20185329 | [2019/42] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553243 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3553243 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/70, // E04B2/02 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
E04B2/702 (EP,FI);
E04C3/122 (FI);
E04B2/08 (EP);
E04C2/12 (EP);
E04C2/40 (EP);
E04B2002/0208 (EP);
E04B2002/0254 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAMINIERTE BLOCKSTRUKTUR, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | [2019/42] | English: | LAMINATED LOG STRUCTURE, METHOD AND USE | [2019/42] | French: | STRUCTURE, PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION DE RONDIN LAMINÉ | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0226567 (VERRAES WOLFGANG P J) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 24-30 * * page 3, lines 20-23 *; | [A]EP3098360 (PRIMAPOLI LTD OY [FI]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0006] - [0010]; figures 1, 2 * |