EP3722637 - A TRANSMISSION FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Geely Automobile Research & Development Co. Ltd. N°. 818, Binhai 2nd Road Hangzhou Bay New District Ningbo 315336 / CN | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄLLNER, Ola Antilopgatan 8 431 38 MÖLNDAL / SE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19167806.9 | 08.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722637 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/091 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F16H3/091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/42] | English: | A TRANSMISSION FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/42] | French: | TRANSMISSION POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4234629 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 14,15 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5280731 (TURPIN GEORGE S [GB]) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]FR3027990 (IFP ENERGIES NOW [FR]) [A] 1,13 * figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP3462058 (IFP ENERGIES NOW [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,11,12 * paragraphs [0024] , [0039] , [0044]; figures 1a, 1b * [A] 6,7 [I] 2,3,8-10,13-15 |