EP3575794 - DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF CD30+ CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seattle Genetics, Inc. 21823 30th Drive, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERTSON, Tina c/o Seattle Genetics, Inc. 21823 30th Drive S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Maria c/o Seattle Genetics, Inc. 21823 30th Drive S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19168115.4 | 08.02.2013 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201261597547P | 10.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261597547 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575794 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61K39/395, A61K47/68, C07K16/28 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/57492 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70578 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DETEKTION UND BEHANDLUNG VON CD30+KARZINOMEN | [2019/49] | English: | DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF CD30+ CANCERS | [2019/49] | French: | DÉTECTION ET TRAITEMENT DES LYMPHOMES T À GRANDES CELLULES CD30+ | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 03.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13746038.2 / EP2812702 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010322920 (KELER TIBOR [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * see [0009-0010, 0035, 0198-0201] *; | [XYI] - "Phase I study of HeFi-1 to treat cancers with CD30 protein", (20021111), National Institutes of Health Clinical Center, Maryland (US), URL: https//clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT00048880, (20190813), XP002793543 [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 11-15 [I] 4,5,7 | [Y] - RYOUICHI HORIE ET AL, "CD30: expression and function in health and disease", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY., US, (19981201), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1006/smim.1998.0156, ISSN 1044-5323, pages 457 - 470, XP055396497 [Y] 11-15 * see p. 459, 461 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/smim.1998.0156 | [Y] - J. KATZ ET AL, "Brentuximab Vedotin (SGN-35)", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20111014), vol. 17, no. 20, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-11-0488, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6428 - 6436, XP055612709 [Y] 11-15 * see p. 6428-6431 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-11-0488 | [Y] - G Pallesen ET AL, "Ki-1 (CD3O) Antigen Is Regularly Expressed by Tumor Cells ofEmbryonal Carcinoma", American Journal of Pathology, (19881201), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC1880812/pdf/amjpathol00129-0028.pdf, (20190814), XP055483398 [Y] 11-15 * see p. 447 * | [A] - SCHWARTING R ET AL, "BER-H2: A NEW ANTI-KI-1 (CD30) MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY DIRECTED AT A FORMOL-RESISTANT EPITOPE", BLOOD,, (19891001), vol. 74, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1678 - 1689, XP009019046 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0000598 | EP0000877 | US4444887 | US4474893 | WO8605807 | EP0239400 | US4714681 | US4716111 | WO8901036 | US4816567 | US4816397 | WO9002809 | US4925648 | WO9007861 | US4946778 | WO9100360 | WO9109967 | WO9110741 | WO9110737 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9205793 | WO9208802 | US5122464 | WO9218619 | EP0519596 | WO9222324 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | WO9317715 | US5258498 | EP0592106 | US5403484 | US5413923 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | US5516637 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571698 | US5573920 | US5580717 | US5585089 | US5601819 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5658727 | US5661016 | US5698426 | US5733743 | WO9816654 | US5750753 | WO9824893 | US5780225 | US5807715 | US5814318 | US5821047 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | US5885793 | US5888809 | US5916771 | US5939598 | US5969108 | US2009018086 | US7498298 | US2009111756 | US7659241 | US7968687 | US2012014943 | - FROESE et al., J. Immunol., (19870000), vol. 139, pages 2081 - 87 | - SCHWAB et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 299, pages 65 - 67 | - TUTT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - MORRISON, Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 1202 | - OI et al., BioTechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, page 214 | - GILLIES et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19890000), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - RIECBMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, page 323 | - PADLAN, Molecular Immunology, (19910000), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA et al., Protein Engineering, (19940000), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA et al., PNAS, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - JESPERS et al., Biotechnology, (19940000), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, Int. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - QUEEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - HAMMERLING et al., In Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, Elsevier, (19810000), pages 563 - 681 | - BRIINNAN et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19950000), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50 | - AMES et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19950000), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186 | - KETTLEBOROUGH et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958 | - PERSIC et al., Gene, (19970000), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18 | - BURTON et al., Advances in Immunology, (19940000), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - MULLINAX et al., BioTechniques, (19920000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869 | - SAWAI et al., AJRI, (19950000), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - BETTER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - HUSTON et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19910000), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88 | - SHU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7999 | - SKERRA et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - FOECKING et al., Gene, (19860000), vol. 45, page 101 | - COCKETT et al., BiolTechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, page 2 | - RUTHER et al., EMBO, (19830000), vol. 1, no. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, Nucleic Acids Res, (19850000), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | - LOGAN; SHENK, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 355 - 359 | - BITTNER et al., Methods in Enzymol, (19870000), vol. 153, pages 51 - 544 | - ALLEY et al., urrent Opinion in Chemical Biology, (20100000), vol. 14, pages 1 - 9 | - SENTER, Cancer J., (20080000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 154 - 169 | - FOX et al., J. Histochem. Cytochem., (19850000), vol. 33, pages 845 - 853 | - SHI et al., J Histochem Cytochem, (19910000), vol. 39, pages 741 - 748 | - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - SEFTON, CRC Crit. Ref. Biomed. Eng., (19890000), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD et al., Surgery, (19800000), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK, N. Engl. J. Med., (19890000), vol. 321, page 574 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, Macromol. Sci. Rev. Macromol. Chem., (19830000), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING et al., Ann. Neurol., (19890000), vol. 25, page 351 | - HOWARD et al., J. Neurosurg, (19890000), vol. 71, page 105 | WO1991GB01134 |