Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10791833 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2020163456 | 28.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW107142150 | 23.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6759404B | Global Dossier | 23.09.2020 | B2 | JP2020081838 | 04.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | TW107142150 | 23.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3656251 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | B1 | EP3656251 | 27.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW107142150 | 23.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202019322 | 01.06.2020 | A | TWI676439B | 11.11.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | TW107142150 | 23.11.2018 |