EP3584255 - MODIFIED AMINO ACIDS COMPRISING AN AZIDO GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 111 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [2022/06] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Street, Suite 150 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAFFORD, Ryan Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
YANG, Wenjin Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
THANOS, Christopher D. Sutro Biopharma, Inc. 310 Utah Street Suite 150 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19168498.4 | 30.08.2013 | [2019/52] | Priority number, date | US201261696087P | 31.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261696087 P | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584255 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584255 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/535, C07C247/00, C07K14/00 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
C07D213/55 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07C247/04 (EP,US);
C07C271/20 (EP,US);
C07C275/14 (EP,US);
C07K14/00 (US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K14/535 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE AMINOSÄUREN MIT EINER AZIDOGRUPPE | [2019/52] | English: | MODIFIED AMINO ACIDS COMPRISING AN AZIDO GROUP | [2019/52] | French: | ACIDES AMINÉS MODIFIÉS COMPRENANT UN GROUPE AZIDO | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13762659.4 / EP2890402 | Divisional application(s) | EP22156390.1 / EP4074728 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008030558 (AMBRX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document ** page 101 *; | [A]WO2008134761 (INTEZYNE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 15 - page 17 *; | [A]WO2010139948 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A] - NGUYEN DUY P ET AL, "Genetic encoding and labeling of aliphatic azides and alkynes in recombinant proteins via a pyrrolysyl-tRNA Synthetase/tRNA(CUA) pair and click chemistry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, UNITED STATES, (20090701), vol. 131, no. 25, doi:10.1021/JA900553W, ISSN 1520-5126, pages 8720 - 8721, XP009127968 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 8721; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja900553w | [A] - HENRIK JOHANSSON ET AL, "Azide- and Alkyne-Derivatised [alpha]-Amino Acids", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20120612), vol. 2012, no. 23, doi:10.1002/ejoc.201200496, ISSN 1434-193X, pages 4267 - 4281, XP055092469 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * Scheme 7; page 4274; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.201200496 | by applicant | SU11248 | US4289872 | US4412989 | US4486414 | EP0154316 | US4542225 | EP0183503 | US4618492 | US4625014 | US4670417 | US4671958 | EP0229108 | US4753894 | US4816444 | US4879278 | US4902502 | WO9005719 | US4943533 | WO9013540 | EP0400472 | US4978744 | EP0402378 | US4986988 | EP0439508 | US5076973 | US5122614 | US5138036 | WO9216555 | EP0510356 | US5219564 | US5229490 | WO9315189 | US5252714 | WO9321259 | US5281698 | WO9404193 | WO9409027 | US5324844 | WO9414758 | EP0606046 | EP0605963 | WO9415625 | WO9417039 | WO9418247 | WO9428024 | WO9500162 | US5382657 | WO9506058 | US5410024 | WO9511924 | WO9513090 | WO9513312 | WO9520045 | US5446090 | US5468478 | US5473034 | WO9533490 | US5476653 | WO9600080 | WO9607670 | US5500362 | US5504191 | WO9613590 | US5516673 | US5521284 | US5530097 | WO9621469 | US5554725 | WO9627583 | US5558864 | US5559213 | WO9629605 | WO9633172 | WO9640210 | WO9640791 | WO9641813 | WO9703106 | US5599902 | US5612460 | US5629384 | WO9718832 | US5635483 | EP0780386 | WO9722596 | US5643575 | US5650234 | WO9730035 | US5663149 | US5665860 | WO9732856 | WO9732607 | US5672662 | US5677171 | EP0809996 | EP0818442 | WO9803516 | WO9805363 | WO9807697 | WO9813354 | US5736137 | US5736625 | US5739208 | US5747646 | US5780588 | WO9830566 | WO9832466 | US5789554 | WO9833768 | WO9834918 | WO9834915 | WO9835985 | US5808096 | WO9841562 | US5824784 | US5824778 | WO9848837 | US5834594 | US5849860 | US5861510 | US5863949 | WO9907675 | US5891996 | US5900461 | EP0921131 | WO9929667 | WO9932134 | WO9932139 | WO9932140 | EP0931788 | US5932462 | EP0945864 | WO9952910 | WO9952889 | US5980948 | US5990237 | US6004573 | US6034065 | EP1004578 | WO0034337 | WO0047212 | US6130237 | US6129912 | US6201072 | US6214966 | WO0132651 | US6235883 | US6239104 | US6258562 | WO0160814 | WO0162931 | US2001021763 | US2001027217 | US6306821 | WO0188138 | US2001044526 | US6323315 | US2001056171 | US2002002250 | US2002037949 | US2002040076 | US2002052009 | US2002052430 | US2002072573 | US2002082345 | US2002086939 | US6420339 | US2002099133 | US6436386 | US6451346 | US6461603 | US2002156047 | WO02088172 | US6506883 | US2003023023 | US6515100 | US6552167 | US2003083263 | WO03039486 | US2003105275 | US2003105224 | US2003114647 | US2003158333 | US6610281 | US2003162949 | US6646110 | US2003220447 | US2003228274 | US2004001838 | US2004013637 | WO2004010957 | WO2004016778 | EP1444268 | US2005009751 | US6914128 | US2005147610 | US2005238649 | WO2005111082 | US7045337 | US7083970 | US7247301 | WO2007124299 | US2008085277 | WO2008066583 | US2008233611 | US2008317670 | US2009093405 | US2010093082 | US2010098630 | - MAYNARD; GEORGIOU, Annu. Rev. Biomed. Eng., (20000000), vol. 2, pages 339 - 76 | - HUDSON, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 9, pages 395 - 402 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19700000), vol. 2, page 482c | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19770000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 89, page 10915 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - CHIN J. et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 301, pages 964 - 7 | - WANG, Q. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20030000), vol. 125, pages 3192 - 3193 | - CHIN, J. W. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), vol. 124, pages 9026 - 9027 | - PADWA, A., COMPREHENSIVE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (19910000), vol. 4, pages 1069 - 1109 | - HUISGEN, R., 1,3-DIPOLAR CYCLOADDITION CHEMISTRY, (19840000), pages 1 - 176 | - TORNOE, C. W. et al., J. Org. Chem., (20020000), vol. 67, pages 3057 - 3064 | - ROSTOVTSEV et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20020000), vol. 41, pages 2596 - 2599 | - BRUGGEMANN; TAUSSIG, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19970000), vol. 8, pages 455 - 458 | - GRIFFITHS; DUNCAN, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 9, pages 102 - 108 | - CLARK, Immunol. Today, (20000000), vol. 21, pages 397 - 402 | - PRESTA, L. G., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 116, pages 731 - 6 | - MURTHY et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19870000), vol. 252, no. 2, pages 549 - 60 | - RODECK et al., J. Cell. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 315 - 20 | - KETTLEBOROUGH et al., Protein Eng., (19910000), vol. 4, no. 7, pages 773 - 83 | - MODJTAHEDI et al., J. Cell. Biophys., (19930000), vol. 22, no. 1-3, pages 129 - 46 | - MODJTAHEDI et al., Br. J. Cancer, (19930000), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 247 - 53 | - MODJTAHEDI et al., Br. J. Cancer, (19960000), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 228 - 35 | - MODJTAHEDI et al., Int. J. Cancer, (20030000), vol. 105, no. 2, pages 273 - 80 | - MATEO et al., Immunotechnol, (19970000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 71 - 81 | - JUNGBLUTH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (20030000), vol. 100, no. 2, pages 639 - 44 | - "Antibodies to growth factors and receptors", MENDELSOHN; BASELGA, Biologic Therapy of Cancer, J B Lippincott, (19950000), pages 607 - 623 | - BURROWS et al., "Association of asthma with serum IgE levels and skin-test reactivity to allergens", New Engl. L. Med., (19890000), vol. 320, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJM198902023200502, pages 271 - 277, XP008136840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM198902023200502 | - FANGER, M W et al., Crit Rev Immunol., (19920000), vol. 12, no. 34, pages 101 - 24 | - NOLAN, O; R. O'KENNEDY, Biochim Biophys Acta, (19900801), vol. 1040, no. 1, pages 1 - 11 | - CHARI et al., Cancer Res., (19920000), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131 | - Angew Chem. Intl. Ed. Engl., (19940000), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - SANDLER; KARO, Polymer Synthesis, Academic Press, vol. 3, pages 138 - 161 | - E. SAXON; C. BERTOZZI, Science, (20000000), vol. 287, pages 2007 - 2010 | - BUCKMANN et al., Makromol. Chem., (19810000), vol. 182, page 1379 | - ZAPLIPSKY et al., Eur. Polym. J., (19830000), vol. 19, page 1177 | - ANDRESZ et al., Makromol. Chem., (19780000), vol. 179, page 301 | - OLSON et al., Poly(ethylene glycol) Chemistry & Biological Applications, ACS, (19970000), pages 170 - 181 | - ABUCHOWSKI et al., Cancer Biochem. Biophys., (19840000), vol. 7, page 175 | - JOPPICH et al., Macrolol. Chem., (19790000), vol. 180, page 1381 | - PITHA et al., Eur. J Biochem., (19790000), vol. 94, page 11 | - ELLING et al., Biotech. Appl. Biochem., (19910000), vol. 13, page 354 | - BEAUCHAMP et al., Anal. Biochem., (19830000), vol. 131, page 25 | - TONDELLI et al., J. Controlled Release, (19850000), vol. 1, page 251 | - VERONESE et al., Appl. Biochem. Biotech., (19850000), vol. 11, page 141 | - SARTORE et al., Appl. Biochem. Biotech., (19910000), vol. 27, page 45 | - HARRIS et al., J. Polym. Sci. Chem. Ed., (19840000), vol. 22, page 341 | - GOODSON et al., Bio/Technology, (19900000), vol. 8, page 343 | - ROMANI et al., Chemistry of Peptides and Proteins, (19840000), vol. 2, page 29 | - KOGAN, Synthetic Comm, (19920000), vol. 22, page 2417 | - WOGHIREN et al., Bioconj. Chem., (19930000), vol. 4, page 314 | - SAWHNEY et al., Macromolecules, (19930000), vol. 26, page 581 | - POLYMERIC DRUGS AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS, ACS Symposium Series, American Chemical Society, (19910000), vol. 469 | - HARRIS, Macronol. Chem. Phys., (19850000), vol. C25, pages 325 - 373 | - SCOUTEN, Methods in Enzymology, (19870000), vol. 135, pages 30 - 65 | - WONG et al., Enzyme Microb. Technol., (19920000), vol. 14, pages 866 - 874 | - DELGADO et al., Critical Reviews in Therapeutic Drug Carrier Systems, (19920000), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - ZALIPSKY, Bioconjugate Chem., (19950000), vol. 6, pages 150 - 165 | - VERONESE, Biochem. Biotech., (19850000), vol. 11, pages 141 - 45 | - PROTEIN PURIFICATION METHODS, A PRACTICAL APPROACH, IRL Press, (19890000), pages 293 - 306 | - PEPINSKY B. et al., J. Pharmcol. & Exp. Ther., (20010000), vol. 297, no. 3, pages 1059 - 66 | - HARLOW; LANE, Polypeptides: A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory, (19880000), pages 555 - 612 | WO2003US40426 |