EP3721835 - HEART VALVE PROTHESIS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING FUNCTIONAL DEGRADATION OF THE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK AG Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degen, Nicholas Bahnhofstrasse 36 8222 Beringen / CH | 02 /
Ulmer, Jens Fritz-Gottlieb Pfister-Weg 22 8703 Erlenbach / CH | 03 /
Finnberg, Thomas Kyburgstrasse 29 8037 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Stiehm, Michael Albin-Köbis-Strasse 5f 18146 Rostock / DE | 05 /
Erdbrügger, Wilhelm Westerwikstrasse 79 44379 Dortmund / DE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7-9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Keck, Hans-Georg Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 19168856.3 | 12.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721835 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, // A61B5/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP);
A61B5/026 (EP);
A61B5/4851 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES FUNKTIONSABBAUS DER PROTHESE | [2020/42] | English: | HEART VALVE PROTHESIS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING FUNCTIONAL DEGRADATION OF THE PROSTHESIS | [2020/42] | French: | PROTHÈSE VALVULAIRE CARDIAQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA DÉGRADATION FONCTIONNELLE DE LA PROTHÈSE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016045316 (BRAIDO PETER N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,14 * paragraphs [0031] - [0041]; figures 3A,3B,4B * [I] 4,5,8-12; | [XI]US2017258585 (MARQUEZ SALVADOR [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,13 * paragraphs [0159] - [0185]; figures 20-25 * [I] 2-5,8-12,14; | [A] - MUSII ROMAN ET AL, "Modeling and calculation of the temperature-force regime of functioning of a spherical bimetallic sensor in a nonstationary electromagnetic field", 2019 IEEE 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE EXPERIENCE OF DESIGNING AND APPLICATION OF CAD SYSTEMS (CADSM), IEEE, (20190226), doi:10.1109/CADSM.2019.8779355, pages 1 - 4, XP033583989 [A] 1,7-12 * Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CADSM.2019.8779355 |