EP3722947 - DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUES, Pascal Sültebreite 31 37520 Osterode am Harz / DE | 02 /
DONNER, Olaf In Der Delle 9 31177 Harsum / DE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Stephann, Valérie Annabelle, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 19169109.6 | 12.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722947 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/451, G06F9/54 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP);
G06F3/1423 (CN);
G06F3/1446 (US);
G06F9/4555 (US);
G06F9/54 (EP);
G06T1/20 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTES SYSTEM ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON INHALT | [2020/42] | English: | DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A CONTENT | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DISTRIBUÉ POUR AFFICHER UN CONTENU | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 26.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2023 | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/11] | 06.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 07.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015254048 (MORTON JOSEPH SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2016246560 (PETROV JULIAN [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016328272 (AHMED WAHEED [DE], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0131] * [I] 2-9 |