EP3560366 - GARMENT COMPRISING A REFLECTING COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2023/36] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPUIS, Serge Chef-Lieu 73610 Lepin Le Lac / FR | 02 /
TORTEL, Arnaud 2761 Les Rouvières 26220 Dieulefit / FR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Lapierre, Stéphane, et al SALOMON S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 19169235.9 | 15.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | FR20180000443 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1800443 | [2019/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560366 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560366 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A41D31/32, B32B5/24, A41D13/00, A61N5/06 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A41D13/0015 (EP);
A41D1/00 (CN);
A41D31/325 (EP,CN);
A61N5/0625 (EP);
A41D2400/10 (EP);
A61N2005/0645 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | A41D13/00, A61N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK, BESTEHEND AUS EINER REFLEKTORBESCHICHTUNG | [2019/44] | English: | GARMENT COMPRISING A REFLECTING COATING | [2019/44] | French: | VÊTEMENT COMPRENANT UN REVÊTEMENT RÉFLECTEUR | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 25.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003180794 (YAMAKAKU ENTERPRISE KK) [X] 1,2,6,10,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 15] , [0 18] , [0 19]; figures 5-7, 9, 10, 13 * [I] 7-9; | [I]FR2957495 (SALOMON SAS [FR]) [I] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12,13* page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 10; figure 1 *; | [X]EP3031431 (SKIN UP [FR]) [X] 1,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 20] , [0 33] , [0 77] - [0081]; figures 6, 8a-9 * | Examination | CN106334270 |