EP3536624 - COMPOSITE PALLET FOR TRANSPORTING AND LONG TERM STORAGE OF BARRELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cabka GmbH & Co. KG Anne-Frank-Strasse 1 07806 Weira / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELDHUIS, Evert Donaustrasse 7 12043 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LENZ, Thorsten Bronteweg 7 14055 Berlin / DE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 19169475.1 | 08.06.2016 | [2019/37] | Previously filed application, date | EP20160173533 | 08.06.2016 | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536624 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/00, B65D19/38, B65D19/44, B65D85/62, B65D19/26, B65D19/32 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
B65D19/44 (EP,US);
B65D19/0012 (EP,US);
B65D19/0081 (EP,US);
B65D19/385 (EP,US);
B65D85/62 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00094 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00099 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00109 (US);
B65D2519/00129 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00134 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00318 (US);
B65D2519/00343 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00373 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDPALETTE ZUM TRANSPORT UND ZUR LANGZEITLAGERUNG VON FÄSSERN | [2019/37] | English: | COMPOSITE PALLET FOR TRANSPORTING AND LONG TERM STORAGE OF BARRELS | [2019/37] | French: | PALLETTE COMPOSITE POUR LE TRANSPORT ET LE STOCKAGE A LONG TERME DE RECIPIENTS | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 11.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16173533.7 / EP3254983 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011259249 (OGBURN SEAN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,11,15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-5, 8 *; | [Y]WO2016033414 (TRANSP LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,11,15 * page 5, line 24 - line 27; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1652784 (TARPACK S L [ES]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]NL7207188 (MALAGA AB) [A] 6-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2012010138 (WEHREN UDO [DE]) [A] 2 * figures 6a, 6b * | by applicant | EP2722285 | DE3504314 |