EP3539921 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING A CONTAINER TO BE FILLED WITH A FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinzinger, Rupert c/o KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 19169483.5 | 02.04.2015 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | DE201410104872 | 04.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014104872 | [2019/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539921 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3539921 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/16, B67C3/12, B67C3/26 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B67C3/16 (EP,US);
B67C3/10 (US);
B67C3/12 (EP,US);
B67C3/26 (US);
B67C3/2634 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/38] | B67C3/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES ZU BEFÜLLENDEN BEHÄLTERS MIT EINEM FÜLLPRODUKT | [2019/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING A CONTAINER TO BE FILLED WITH A FILLER | [2019/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RÉCIPIENT À REMPLIR D'UN PRODUIT DE REMPLISSAGE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 13.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15162344.4 / EP2927189 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2124581 (ROBERT LUTHI) [X] 1-3,5 * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 43; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,6-8 [I] 9,10; | [A]GB1027597 (OWENS ILLINOIS W C) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19606465 (BUSCH GMBH K [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 39 - line 49; figure . *; | [A]DE19806520 (RUEDIGER HAAGA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* figure . *; | [A]US6220310 (EMMER GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 31 - line 59; figure 4 * | Examination | US2001045242 | by applicant | US2124581 | DE8308618U | DE8308806U |