EP3725851 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING SURFACE-REACTED CALCIUM CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERARD, Daniel E. Rheinfelderstrasse 12 4058 Basel / CH | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Glas, Holger Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19169504.8 | 16.04.2019 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725851 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
C09C1/021 (EP,KR);
C09C1/022 (US);
C09C1/024 (KR);
C09D11/00 (KR);
C09D5/00 (KR);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENREAKTIVEM CALCIUMCARBONAT | [2020/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING SURFACE-REACTED CALCIUM CARBONATE | [2020/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CARBONATE DE CALCIUM TRAITÉ PAR RÉACTION EN SURFACE | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP1712523 (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]) [XD] 11,14,15 * paragraphs [0073] - [0123]; claims 1-23 * [A] 1-10; | [XA]EP2997833 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [X] 11,12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0084]; claims 1-14 * [A] 1-10; | [XA]EP3275947 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [X] 11-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0038] - [0082] - [0136]; claims 1-24 * [A] 1-10; | [XDA]EP3275948 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [XD] 11-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024] - [0047] - [0102] - [0120] - [0137]; claims 1-19 * [A] 1-10; | [XA]EP3275946 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [X] 11-15 * claims 1-34 * [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2018159484 (SHIRAISHI KOGYO KAISHA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0017] - [0102] * | by applicant | US4219590 | US5043017 | US5584923 | WO9708247 | US5647902 | US5711799 | WO9820079 | WO9902608 | US6666953 | WO2004083316 | WO2005121257 | EP1712597 | EP1712523 | EP2264109 | EP2371766 | EP2447213 | EP2524898 | WO2013142473 | EP2722368 | EP2770017 | EP3042878 | WO2016113285 | EP3275948 | - GANE, P.A.C.; KETTLE, J.P.; MATTHEWS, G.P.; RIDGWAY, C.J., "Void Space Structure of Compressible Polymer Spheres and Consolidated Calcium Carbonate Paper-Coating Formulations", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry Research, (19960000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1753 - 1764 | - GANE, P.A.C.; KETTLE, J.P.; MATTHEWS, G.P.; RIDGWAY, C.J., "Void Space Structure of Compressible Polymer Spheres and Consolidated Calcium Carbonate Paper-Coating Formulations", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry Research, (19960000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages l753 - 1764 |