Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3537343 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3537343



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(56)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 423
25.08.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.09.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.09.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.05.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.05.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.05.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.05.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 68
15.05.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 68
24.04.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.03.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.03.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.03.2020 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.03.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
10.03.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
10.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.02.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.02.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 4
10.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.02.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 2
18.11.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.11.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.09.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.07.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.05.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
29.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
16.04.2019 Description Search / examination 62
16.04.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
16.04.2019 Drawings Search / examination 14
16.04.2019 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
28.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79
28.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40