EP3533439 - STICK-SHAPED BASE MATERIAL CONTAINING LIPID PEPTIDE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6119 / JP | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imoto, Takayuki c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd., Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba, 274-8507 / JP | 02 /
Kashino, Tsubasa c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd., Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba, 274-8507 / JP | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 19169794.5 | 25.12.2014 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | JP20130267608 | 25.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013267608 | JP20140134784 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014134784 | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533439 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61K8/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/24, A61K47/42, A61Q19/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61K8/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K8/0229 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/345 (KR,US);
A61K8/361 (KR,US);
A61K8/553 (KR);
A61K8/676 (KR,US);
A61K8/86 (KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/10 (KR);
A61K2800/87 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | STIFTFÖRMIGES BASISMATERIAL MIT LIPID-PEPTIDVERBINDUNG | [2019/36] | English: | STICK-SHAPED BASE MATERIAL CONTAINING LIPID PEPTIDE COMPOUND | [2019/36] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE BASE SOUS FORME DE BÂTON CONTENANT UN COMPOSÉ DE PEPTIDE LIPIDIQUE | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 04.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14873681.2 / EP3087971 | Divisional application(s) | EP21169841.0 / EP3881823 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR2810323 (SHISEIDO INT FRANCE [FR]); | [I]WO2007124770 (PENTAPHARM AG [CH], et al); | [I]EP2319894 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2012133787 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH03279319 | JP2002516818 |