EP3540772 - TRANSISTOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Shunpei Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Sakakura, Masayuki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Ryosuke Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Sakata, Junichiro Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Akimoto, Kengo Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Miyanaga, Akiharu Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Hirohashi, Takuya Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 08 /
Kishida, Hideyuki Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 19169904.0 | 26.08.2010 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | JP20090215084 | 16.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009215084 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540772 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L29/786, H01L29/04 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
H01L29/7869 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/786 (CN);
G02F1/1362 (CN);
H01L27/1225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/045 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/06 (CN);
H01L29/78618 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78693 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSISTOR UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/38] | English: | TRANSISTOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/38] | French: | TRANSISTOR ET AFFICHEUR | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 16.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10817049.9 / EP2478554 | EP12181246.5 / EP2544237 | EP17169070.4 / EP3217435 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007055256 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [A]US2007187678 (HIRAO TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2008099803 (LI YUNING [CA], et al) | by applicant | JP20070096055 | JP20070123861 | JP20090215084 |