EP3540257 - A METHOD OF ADJUSTING A BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [2022/29] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARULA, Prashant Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | 02 /
TAYLOR, Martin Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | 03 /
HANSSON, Mikael Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Ayre, Nicola Unity Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/29] |
Former [2019/38] | Jones, John Bryn Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19170249.7 | 15.08.2013 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540257 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3540257 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/22, B60T7/04, F16D65/18, F16D65/56 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
F16D65/62 (EP,US);
B60T13/741 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T7/22 (EP,US);
F16D55/22 (EP,US);
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2125/36 (EP,US);
F16D2125/40 (EP,US);
F16D2129/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER BREMSE | [2019/38] | English: | A METHOD OF ADJUSTING A BRAKE | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'UN FREIN | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 18.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13180589.7 / EP2837533 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.08.2013 | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | CY | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | MK | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | IE | 15.08.2022 | LU | 15.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | GB | 20.10.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/26] | HU | 15.08.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 20.10.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.08.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 20.10.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.08.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 20.10.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 20.10.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.08.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3550732 (BELLER ALBERT) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US3976168 (YAMAMOTO MAYJUE A) [X] 15 * columns 1-3 *; | [X]GB2063399 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [X] 15 * pages 1-3 *; | [XY]DE10118707 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 13 * paragraphs 1, 3, 7, 8, 9, 13, 28-30 * [Y] 5-10; | [A]DE10325266 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]DE10355219 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs 1, 2, 6, 7, 9-12 *; | [A]EP1557332 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2005206236 (MORI YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs 2, 3, 59, 61, 66 - 70 and 80 * [Y] 11; | [XY]US2007235268 (CARON LAVERNE A [US]) [X] 14 * paragraphs 1-5 * [Y] 12; | [A]JP2009190686 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE102009058154 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraphs 1, 2, 8, 10, 12, 25, 26, 29 * [Y] 5-12 | Examination | EP0789156 | DE19758030 | EP0995921 | FR2757918 | EP1233202 | DE10256426 | DE19935934 | WO2005036012 | EP1544493 | WO2006032447 | DE19861109 | WO2007051809 | EP1972825 | by applicant | EP0100263 | EP0995923 | EP1000263 |