EP3560887 - WORK PLATFORM WITH EXTENSION DECK AND WORK STEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA MANUFACTURING AND ENGINEERING CO., LLC 1401 S. Madera Ave. Kerman, CA 93630 / US | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/16] | For all designated states CALIFORNIA MANUFACTURING AND ENGINEERING CO., LLC 1401 S. Madera Ave. Kerman, CA 93630 / US | ||
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states California Manufacturing Engineering Company LLC 1401 South Madera Ave. Kerman, CA 93630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROOK, Gary 1401 S. Madera Ave. Kerman, California 93630 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/43] |
Former [2019/44] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19170465.9 | 23.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | US201862663465P | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663465 P | US201916275854 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: US201916275854 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560887 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560887 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66F11/04 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
B66F11/04 (EP,US);
B66F11/042 (US);
B66F13/00 (US);
B66F17/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARBEITSPLATTFORM MIT ERWEITERUNGSDECK UND ARBEITSSTUFE | [2019/44] | English: | WORK PLATFORM WITH EXTENSION DECK AND WORK STEP | [2019/44] | French: | PLATEFORME DE TRAVAIL DOTÉE D'UN PONT D'EXTENSION ET MARCHE DE TRAVAIL | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3664458 (STERNS LORANCE E, et al); | [A]US4883145 (DELTATTO CHARLES D [US]); | [Y]EP2479135 (CALIFORNIA MFG ENGINEERING COMPANY LLC [US]); | [AP]CN207618972U (SUZHOU RUYI LOGISTICS EQUIPMENT CO LTD) |