Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2025071609 | ![]() | 03.04.2025 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202318475831 | 27.09.2023 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2018183535 | ![]() | 04.10.2018 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201715471877 | 28.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9580165 | ![]() | 28.02.2017 | B1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9555873 | ![]() | 31.01.2017 | B1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9545991 | ![]() | 17.01.2017 | B1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024208637 | ![]() | 27.06.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US202318149550 | 03.01.2023 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201916700436 | 02.12.2019 | |||
US202418426110 | 29.01.2024 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2024017815 | ![]() | 18.01.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US202318475831 | 27.09.2023 | |||
US202318149550 | 03.01.2023 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201916700436 | 02.12.2019 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9902488 | ![]() | 27.02.2018 | B2 | |
US2017291685 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615388396 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9902487 | ![]() | 27.02.2018 | B2 | |
US2017291684 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388478 | 22.12.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11958588 | ![]() | 16.04.2024 | B2 | |
US2021403143 | 30.12.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615388396 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201715471877 | 28.03.2017 | |||
US202117472388 | 10.09.2021 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201615388478 | 22.12.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11884388 | ![]() | 30.01.2024 | B2 | |
US2023142917 | 11.05.2023 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US202318149550 | 03.01.2023 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201916700436 | 02.12.2019 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11541986 | ![]() | 03.01.2023 | B2 | |
US2020102065 | 02.04.2020 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201916700436 | 02.12.2019 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11117649 | ![]() | 14.09.2021 | B2 | |
US2017197702 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615388396 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201715471877 | 28.03.2017 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
US201615388478 | 22.12.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10494081 | ![]() | 03.12.2019 | B2 | |
US2017291686 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615388433 | 22.12.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR20230159626 | ![]() | 21.11.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
KR20237004318 | 21.04.2016 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102601850B | ![]() | 13.11.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022280 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102593400B | ![]() | 23.10.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022275 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102593398B | ![]() | 23.10.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022277 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102574665B | ![]() | 04.09.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022279 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102574663B | ![]() | 04.09.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022278 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102574661B | ![]() | 04.09.2023 | B1 | |
KR20230022276 | 14.02.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
KR20187016428 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102574660B | ![]() | 04.09.2023 | B1 | |
KR20180082539 | 18.07.2018 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2025041650 | ![]() | 26.03.2025 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
JP2023061193 | 05.04.2023 | |||
JP2022045692 | 22.03.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2023082182 | ![]() | 13.06.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
JP2022045692 | 22.03.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2023082181 | ![]() | 13.06.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
JP2022045692 | 22.03.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7289954B | ![]() | 12.06.2023 | B2 | |
JP2022081668 | 31.05.2022 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
JP2018226114 | 30.11.2018 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7230100B | ![]() | 28.02.2023 | B2 | |
JP2021130460 | 09.09.2021 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
JP2021070570 | 19.04.2021 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7352593B | ![]() | 28.09.2023 | B2 | |
JP2021104806 | 26.07.2021 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2018524480 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6872545B | ![]() | 19.05.2021 | B2 | |
JP2019501814 | 24.01.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL316832 | ![]() | 01.01.2025 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL315342 | ![]() | 01.10.2024 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL309829 | ![]() | 01.02.2024 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2023US75373 | 28.09.2023 | |||
US202318475831 | 27.09.2023 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL301988 | ![]() | 01.04.2025 | B2 | |
IL301988 | 01.12.2024 | B1 | ||
IL301988 | 01.06.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL301987 | ![]() | 01.06.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL301985 | ![]() | 01.01.2025 | B2 | |
IL301985 | 01.09.2024 | B1 | ||
IL301985 | 01.06.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL301984 | ![]() | 01.05.2025 | B2 | |
IL301984 | 01.01.2025 | B1 | ||
IL301984 | 01.06.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL300908 | ![]() | 01.05.2025 | B1 | |
IL300908 | 01.04.2023 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2018US24891 | 28.03.2018 | |||
US201715471877 | 28.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL269770 | ![]() | 01.07.2023 | B2 | |
IL269770 | 01.03.2023 | B1 | ||
IL269770 | 28.11.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2018US24891 | 28.03.2018 | |||
US201715471877 | 28.03.2017 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL262914 | ![]() | 01.10.2023 | B2 | |
IL262914 | 01.06.2023 | B1 | ||
IL262914 | 31.12.2018 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL262910 | ![]() | 01.05.2025 | B2 | |
IL262910 | 01.01.2025 | B1 | ||
IL262910 | 31.12.2018 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL259274 | ![]() | 01.10.2023 | B2 | |
IL259274 | 01.06.2023 | B1 | ||
IL259274 | 31.07.2018 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4467469 | ![]() | 12.03.2025 | A3 | |
EP4467469 | 27.11.2024 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
EP23152519 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP19170491 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4292923 | ![]() | 24.01.2024 | A3 | |
EP4292923 | 20.12.2023 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP19170501 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4292922 | ![]() | 24.01.2024 | A3 | |
EP4292922 | 20.12.2023 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP19170501 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4292921 | ![]() | 24.01.2024 | A3 | |
EP4292921 | 20.12.2023 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP19170501 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4190687 | ![]() | 07.06.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP19170491 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3560820 | ![]() | 07.06.2023 | C0 | |
EP3560820 | ![]() | 07.06.2023 | B1 | |
EP3560820 | 30.10.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3374260 | ![]() | 01.06.2022 | B1 | |
EP3374260 | 18.09.2019 | A4 | ||
EP3374260 | 19.09.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3178198 | ![]() | 18.05.2017 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
CA3005149 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3178186 | ![]() | 18.05.2017 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
CA3005149 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3005149 | ![]() | 16.01.2024 | C | |
CA3005149 | 18.05.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2024278110 | ![]() | 02.01.2025 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2024278110 | 04.12.2024 | |||
AU2022211805 | 02.08.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2024219595 | ![]() | 03.10.2024 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211805 | 02.08.2022 | |||
AU2023200510 | 31.01.2023 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2024219595 | 11.09.2024 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2023387755 | ![]() | 10.04.2025 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2023US75373 | 28.09.2023 | |||
US202318475831 | 27.09.2023 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2023200510B | ![]() | 13.06.2024 | B2 | |
AU2023200510 | 02.03.2023 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211805 | 02.08.2022 | |||
AU2023200510 | 31.01.2023 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211806B | ![]() | 16.03.2023 | B2 | |
AU2022211806 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211806 | 02.08.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211805B | ![]() | 05.09.2024 | B2 | |
AU2022211805 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211805 | 02.08.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211804B | ![]() | 01.12.2022 | B2 | |
AU2022211804 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211804 | 02.08.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211803B | ![]() | 11.05.2023 | B2 | |
AU2022211803 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
AU2022211803 | 02.08.2022 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211802B | ![]() | 01.06.2023 | B2 | |
AU2022211802 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2022211802 | 02.08.2022 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2022211801B | ![]() | 30.03.2023 | B2 | |
AU2022211801 | 25.08.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2022211801 | 02.08.2022 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2021212022B | ![]() | 30.03.2023 | B2 | |
AU2021212022 | 26.08.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
AU2021212022 | 04.08.2021 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
AU2016351357 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2016351357B | ![]() | 12.08.2021 | B2 | |
AU2016351357 | 24.05.2018 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP3536607 | ![]() | 17.01.2024 | C0 | |
EP3536607 | ![]() | 17.01.2024 | B1 | |
EP3536607 | 11.09.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
EP16864692 | 21.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
BR112018009344 | 26.02.2019 | A8 | ||
BR112018009344 | 13.11.2018 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK3374260T | 29.08.2022 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2922083T | 07.09.2022 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
TR201806641T | 23.07.2018 | T1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
WO2016US28649 | 21.04.2016 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2017082954 | ![]() | 18.05.2017 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2019069762 | ![]() | 09.05.2019 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP7045976B | ![]() | 01.04.2022 | B2 | |
JP2019059472 | 18.04.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2946895T | 27.07.2023 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2970693T | 30.05.2024 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201615092237 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201615092257 | 06.04.2016 | |||
US201562254098 | 11.11.2015 | |||
US201615092219 | 06.04.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
EP4292921 | ||||
EP4292922 | ||||
EP4292923 | ||||
Type | ![]() | |||
EP3374260 |