EP3730037 - DETERMINATION OF A REFRACTION ERROR OF AN EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leube, Alexander Hanfgarten 4a 72072 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
Ohlendorf, Arne Reutlinger Strasse 9/2 72072 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
Wahl, Siegfried Poststrasse 28/1 73072 Donzdorf / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19170561.5 | 23.04.2019 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730037 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/103, A61B3/028 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A61B3/103 (EP);
A61B3/032 (US);
A61B3/0041 (US);
A61B3/028 (EP);
A61B3/113 (US);
A61B3/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINES REFRAKTIONSFEHLERS EINES AUGES | [2020/44] | English: | DETERMINATION OF A REFRACTION ERROR OF AN EYE | [2020/44] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ERREUR DE RÉFECTION D'UN IL | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012019779 (LEGERTON JEROME A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029] - [0037] - [0040] * [I] 6,10,12,14,15; | [XI]US2013176534 (FRANKFORT BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,13 * paragraphs [0039] - [0066] *[I] 6-10,12,14,15 | by applicant | US6402320 | US2014268060 | US2015070273 | WO2018077690 | - RUCCI, M.; IOVIN, R, POLETTI, M.; SANTINI, F., "Miniature eye movements enhance fine spatial detail", Nature, (20070000), vol. 447, no. 7146, page 852 | - DENNISS, J.; SCHOLES, C.; MCGRAW, P. V.; NAM, S. H.; ROACH, N. W., "Estimation of Contrast Sensitivity From Fixational Eye Movements", Investigative Ophthalmology & Visual Science, (20180000), vol. 59, no. 13, pages 5408 - 16 | - BEISPIEL P.; BLIGNAUT, "Mapping the Pupil-Glint Vector to Gaze Coordinates in a Simple Video-Based Eye Tracker", Journal of Eye Movement Research, (19950000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 1 - 11 | - A. LEUBE et al., "Individual neural transfer function affects the prediction of subjective depth of focus", Scientific Reports, (20180000), vol. 8, no. 1, page 1919 | - NACH L. N. THIBOS; W. WHEELER; D. HORNER, "Power Vectors: An Application of Fourier Analysis to the Description and Statistical Analysis of Refractive Error", Optometry and Vision Science, (19970000), vol. 74, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1097/00006324-199706000-00019, pages 367 - 375, XP008078911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006324-199706000-00019 |