Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3537238 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3537238



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 756
26.06.2024 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.09.2023 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
27.07.2023 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2023 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.07.2023 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
11.07.2023 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
05.04.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.04.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.04.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 101
05.04.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 101
15.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.06.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 69
15.06.2022 Description Search / examination 55
15.06.2022 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.06.2022 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
07.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2022 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.02.2022 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2021 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
03.02.2021 Description Search / examination 2
03.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.02.2021 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.11.2020 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.10.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.02.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
17.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
17.02.2020 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
17.02.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
17.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.09.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
09.07.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.07.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.07.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 7
05.07.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
05.07.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.05.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.04.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
23.04.2019 Description Search / examination 65
23.04.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
23.04.2019 Drawings Search / examination 39
23.04.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76