EP3572190 - MULTISPEED POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEHNE, Mr Brent A. 95 Wynshire Lane Red Lion, PA Pennsylvania 17356 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jianhua No. 2 Wan Sheng Road Sushou. Jiangsu / CN | 03 /
GAO, Jian No. 113, Jinliang Street Suzhou, Jiangsu / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Wen Xingdon Community Daxin Town Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu / CN | 05 /
WANG, Guoquing 3-1803, Ya Ge Er Wei Lai Cheng Shen Hu Road Suzhou, Jiangsu / CN | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 19170612.6 | 23.04.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | US201815986999 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: US201815986999 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572190 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572190 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B25B21/02 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B25F5/001 (EP);
B25B21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSWERKZEUG MIT MEHREREN GESCHWINDIGKEITEN | [2019/48] | English: | MULTISPEED POWER TOOL | [2019/48] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE MULTIVITESSE | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2019 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | IE | 23.04.2022 | LU | 23.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | FR | 06.06.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 23.04.2019 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 06.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.04.2019 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 06.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 06.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 06.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 06.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 23.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19705378 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figure 3 *[A] 8; | [XA]EP1946895 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0035]; figure 3 * [A] 8-10,12-15; | [X]EP2551064 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,5,6,7,8,9 *; | [XA]DE102015119987 (FEIN C & E GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 5,6,7,10,12,16,17,18 * [A] 8-10,12,14,15 |