EP3730556 - POWDER COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIGER Coatings GmbH & Co. KG Negrellistrasse 36 4600 Wels / AT | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIZINGER, Franziska c/o TIGER COATINGS GMBH & CO. KG Negrellistr. 36 4600 Wels / AT | 02 /
LOIBL, Thomas c/o TIGER COATINGS GMBH & CO. KG Negrellistr. 36 4600 Wels / AT | 03 /
LUTZ, Christian c/o TIGER COATINGS GMBH & CO. KG Negrellistr. 36 4600 Wels / AT | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 19171360.1 | 26.04.2019 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730556 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/03, C09D7/62, C09C1/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C09D5/031 (EP);
C09C1/0021 (EP);
C09C1/0081 (EP);
C09C1/644 (EP);
C09D5/035 (EP);
C09D7/62 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
C08K9/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVERBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/44] | English: | POWDER COATING COMPOSITION | [2020/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT PAR PULVÉRISATION | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2005063897 (ECKART GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-11 * page 8, line 9 - line 23 * * page 26, line 6 - line 13 ** claims 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2006189718 (FERENCZ JOSEPH M [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * claims 1, 13, 14, 18-20 *; | [A]CN101311234 (XIAOBING MA [CN]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1, 7, 10 *; | [A]CN108373765 (JIADUOCAI POWDER COATINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * claims 1, 4 * | by applicant | WO2005063897 | DE102007006820 | EP2896661 | EP3144352 | - EMMANOUIL SPYROU, Powder Coatings - Chemistry and Technology |