EP3711866 - FILTER DEVICE FOR SEPARATING OVERSPRAY, COATING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR REPLACING A FILTER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann SE Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Herbert Schillerstr. 14 71134 Aidlingen / DE | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 19171447.6 | 26.04.2019 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | DE201810112738 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018112738 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711866 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B14/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B01D46/42 (EP);
B05B14/43 (EP);
B05B16/00 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSCHEIDEN VON OVERSPRAY, BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM WECHSELN EINES FILTERMODULS | [2020/39] | English: | FILTER DEVICE FOR SEPARATING OVERSPRAY, COATING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR REPLACING A FILTER MODULE | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF FILTRANT PERMETTANT DE SÉPARER UN EXCÉDENT DE PEINTURE PULVÉRISÉE, INSTALLATION DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHANGEMENT DE MODULE FILTRANT | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 31.07.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2020/39] | 03.08.2020 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102011108631 (EISENMANN AG [DE]) [I] 8,9 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070]; figures 6,7 *; | [XI]WO2015062976 (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,13 * page 49 - page 74; figure 1 * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [I]DE102013022252 (EISENMANN AG [DE]) [I] 12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0061] *; | [XI]DE102015008844 (EISENMANN SE [DE]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0090] * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [I]DE102015009690 (EISENMANN SE [DE]) [I] 11 * paragraph [0058] *; | [I]US2017136483 (SLAMA MOUNIR B H [US], et al) [I] 9* paragraph [0097]; figures 16,30 *; | [XI]DE102015015234 (EISENMANN SE [DE]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0090] * [I] 2-12,14,15 |