EP3543310 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1234YF AND HFC-32 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19801 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Velliyur Nott Mallikarjuna - deceased / US | 02 /
Minor, Barbara Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, MD Maryland 21921 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2024/27] |
Former [2019/39] | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19171478.1 | 03.03.2006 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US20050658543P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658543 P | US20050710439P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710439 P | US20050732769P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732769 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543310 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543310 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3543310 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C10M171/00 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C10M171/008 (EP);
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C08J2203/12 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2203/162 (EP);
C08J2203/182 (EP);
C08J2207/04 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C09K2205/126 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C09K2205/40 (EP);
C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2203/1006 (EP);
C10M2205/0206 (EP);
C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2209/043 (EP);
C10M2209/1033 (EP);
C10N2020/101 (EP);
C10N2020/103 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HFC-1234YF UND HFC-32 | [2019/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1234YF AND HFC-32 | [2019/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPORTANT DU HFC-1234YF ET DU HFC-32 | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737345.6 / EP1853679 | EP08014611.1 / EP1985680 | EP18182081.2 / EP3425017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2021
25.08.2021
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 02
25.08.2021
11.10.2022
WITHDRAWN Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku Osaka 530-8323 / JP Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2021
25.08.2021
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
25.08.2021
11.10.2022
WITHDRAWN Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku Osaka 530-8323 / JP Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2021
25.08.2021
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
25.08.2021
Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku Osaka 530-8323 / JP Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 08.09.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.01.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.10.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.03.2024 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2006 | CY | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | LU | 03.03.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/24] | CY | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04110388 ; | [A]US2004127383 (PHAM HANG T [US], et al); | [A]US2004256594 (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al); | by applicant | US5759430 | USRE36951E | US20040910495 | US20050062044 | Opposition | JPH04110388 | WO2004037913 | US2004256594 | WO2005103190 | WO2005105947 | WO2005108523 | EP1985681 | US6214624 | WO2005103187 |