EP3613428 - CYCLIC ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE C-TERMINAL PEPTIDE IN THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF CANCER OR METASTASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuro-Bio Ltd Building F5 Culham Science Centre Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENFIELD, Susan Building F5 Culham Science Centre Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 3BD / GB | 02 /
PEPPER, Christopher c/o Institute of Cancer & Genetics Cardiff University School of Medicine Cancer Genetics Building Cardiff, South Glamorgan CF14 4XN / GB | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 19172010.1 | 18.12.2015 | [2020/09] | Priority number, date | GB20140022715 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201422715 | GB20150008480 | 18.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201508480 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613428 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/46, A61K38/12, A61P35/02, A61P35/04, C12N9/18 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A61K38/465 (EP,CN,GB,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,CN,GB,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP,US);
C12N9/18 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01007 (EP,CN,GB,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | ZYKLICHES ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE C-TERMINALPEPTID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND METASTASE | [2020/09] | English: | CYCLIC ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE C-TERMINAL PEPTIDE IN THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF CANCER OR METASTASIS | [2020/09] | French: | PEPTIDE CYCLIQUE C-TERMINAL DE L'ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE POUR TRAITER LE CANCER ET LES METASTASES | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15816833.6 / EP3233110 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9735962 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9802452 (UNIV MCGILL [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,11,14 * claims 11, 27, 45, 46 * [Y] 1-5,11,14,15; | [X]WO0073427 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [X] 14,15 * SEQ ID NO 2; pages 20,22, paragraph last; claims 14, 19, 20, 27 *; | [XY]US2004204348 (JONES TERENCE R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11,14 * claims 1,22,34,40 * [Y] 1-5,11,14,15; | [Y]WO2007049281 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * SEQ ID NO: 5; page 38, lines 7-21; claims 15, 36, 49, 51 *; | [Y]US2009169520 (SOREQ HERMONA [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * SEQ ID NO: 1;; figure 5e; claims 11, 15, 20 *; | [Y]EP2754451 (SHANGHAI INST BIOL SCIENCES [CN]) [Y] 1-5,14 * claims 9, 15 *; | [XP]WO2015004430 (NEURO BIO LTD [GB]) [XP] 14,15* example 16; claim - *; | [Y] - ONGANER P U ET AL, "An acetylcholinesterase-derived peptide inhibits endocytic membrane activity in a human metastatic breast cancer cell line", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1760, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBAGEN.2005.12.016, ISSN 0304-4165, (20060301), pages 415 - 420, (20060301), XP025014834 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2005.12.016 | by applicant | - THOMPSON et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19940000), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - THOMPSON et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19970000), vol. 24, pages 4876 - 4882 | - CHRISTOPHER J. WHITEANDREI K. YUDIN, Nature Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 3 | - VALERO et al., JPeptide Res., (19990000), vol. 53, pages 76 - 67 | - LIHU YANGGREG MORRIELLO, Tetrahedron Letters, (19990000), vol. 40, pages 8197 - 8200 | - PARVESH WADHWANI et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 55 - 61 |