Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11282251 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2022 | B2 | US2021074043 | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016952662 | 19.11.2020 | US201862665667 | 02.05.2018 | US201916383888 | 15.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10872449 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2020 | B2 | US2019340800 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862665667 | 02.05.2018 | US201916383888 | 15.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110432986B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | B | CN110432986 | 12.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862665667 | 02.05.2018 | US201916383888 | 15.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019202779B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201862665667 | 02.05.2018 | US201916383888 | 15.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3566652 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | B1 | EP3566652 | 13.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862665667 | 02.05.2018 | US201916383888 | 15.04.2019 |