EP3543196 - HYBRID PICKUP TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGAN, Patrick Conall c/o NIKE Innovate C. V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
LEE, Kuo-Hung c/o Feng Tay Enterprises Co. Ltd. No. 52 Kegong 8th Road Doulin City, Yunlin County Taiwan 640 / CN | 03 /
CHANG, Chih-Chi c/o Feng Tay Enterprises Co. Ltd. No. 52 Kegong 8th Road Doulin City, Yunlin County Taiwan 97005-6453 / CN | 04 /
JEAN, Ming-Feng c/o Feng Tay Enterprises Co. Ltd. No. 52 Kegong 8th Road Doulin City, Yunlin County Taiwan 97005-6453 / CN | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 19172153.9 | 16.11.2012 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201113299890 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: US201113299890 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543196 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543196 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/02, B25J15/00, B25J15/06 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B25J15/0052 (EP,KR,US);
B25J15/0675 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B25J15/0616 (EP,US);
B25J11/00 (KR);
B25J15/0691 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B38/1858 (KR,US);
Y10T156/17 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYBRIDES AUFGREIFWERKZEUG | [2019/39] | English: | HYBRID PICKUP TOOL | [2019/39] | French: | OUTIL DE CAPTURE HYBRIDE | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 20.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12850394.3 / EP2780272 | Divisional application(s) | EP21164137.8 / EP3865450 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2012 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | TR | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | IE | 16.11.2021 | LU | 16.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
TR | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1249294 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2617078 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPH03152091 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JPH0614155U (PATENTEE UNKNOWN) [Y] 11,13 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH0627765U (PATENTEE UNKNOWN) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5427301 (PHAM CUONG V [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1-9 *; | [A]JP2004174685 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]JP2005060063 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2042453 (YUSHIN SEIKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US2011123359 (SCHAAF WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0004]; figure 5 * |