EP3572528 - DIRECT CAPTURE, AMPLIFICATION AND SEQUENCING OF TARGET DNA USING IMMOBILIZED PRIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYLLYKANGAS, Samuel Hakamaki 4 K 125 FI-02120 Espoo / FI | 02 /
BUENROSTRO, Jason 3523 Altamont Way Redwood City, CA California 94062 / US | 03 /
JI, Hanlee P. CCSR 1115 - Division of Oncology 269 Campus Drive Stanford, CA California 94305-5151 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19172328.7 | 21.09.2011 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | US201038639010P | 24.09.2010 Original published format: US 38639010 P | US201161485062P | 11.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161485062 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572528 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C40B40/06 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6837 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,KR,US);
C40B40/06 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2525/155, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2565/537 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2525/155, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2565/537 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2525/155, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2565/537 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | DIREKTE ERFASSUNG, AMPLIFIKATION UND SEQUENZIERUNG EINER ZIEL-DNA UNTER VERWENDUNG IMMOBILISIERTER PRIMER | [2019/48] | English: | DIRECT CAPTURE, AMPLIFICATION AND SEQUENCING OF TARGET DNA USING IMMOBILIZED PRIMERS | [2019/48] | French: | CAPTURE DIRECTE, AMPLIFICATION ET SÉQUENÇAGE D'ADN CIBLE À L'AIDE D'AMORCES IMMOBILISÉES | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11827484.4 / EP2619329 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008286795 (KAWASHIMA ERIC H [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0047] , [0049] , [0055] , [0059]; figure 13A *; | [A]US2009117621 (BOUTELL JONATHAN MARK [GB], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [Y]EP2063132 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] *; | [YP]WO2011050981 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [YP] 1-16 * abstract * * page 15, line 11 - line 18 *; | [Y] - SUMMERER D ET AL, "Targeted high throughput sequencing of a cancer-related exome subset by specific sequence capture with a fully automated microarray platform", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, vol. 95, no. 4, ISSN 0888-7543, (20100401), pages 241 - 246, (20100206), XP026987034 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 242, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph middle * | by applicant | US61386390 | US61485062 | EP118274844 | US5635400 | EP0799897 | US5948902 | US5981179 | US7115400 | US2008160580 | US2008286795 | - GUDMUNDSSON et al., Nat. Genet., (20090000), vol. 41, pages 1122 - 6 | - OUT et al., Hum. Mutat., (20090000), vol. 30, pages 1703 - 12 | - TURNER, Nat. Methods, (20090000), vol. 6, pages 315 - 6 | - BRENNER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 1665 - 1670 | - SHOEMAKER et al., Nature Genetics, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 450 - 456 | US20100386390 |